EP0597603 - Trench isolation planarization using a hard mask [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.1999 [1999/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard Massachusetts 01745 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 146 Main Street Maynard, Massachusetts 01745 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grula, Gregory Joseph 170 Brookfield Road Charlton, Massachusetts 01507 / US | 02 /
Wang, Ching-Tai Sherman 94 Bjorklund Avenue Worcester, Massachusetts 01605 / US | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [1998/22] |
Former [1994/20] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson 1 St. Mary's Court St Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308495.6 | 25.10.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | US19920975871 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: US 975871 | [1994/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0597603 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0597603 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76, H01L21/321, H01L21/3105 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
H01L21/76229 (EP);
H01L21/31055 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/20] | H01L21/76, H01L21/321 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/20] | Title | German: | Planarization eines Isolationsgrabens mittels einer harten Maske | [1994/20] | English: | Trench isolation planarization using a hard mask | [1994/20] | French: | Planarisation d'une ramure d'isolation utilisant un masque dur | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/22] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/47] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0424608 (IBM) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 20 *; | [X]EP0341898 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC) [X] 1,2,5-8,10,11 * column 7, line 22 - line 31 * * column 8, line 9 - line 50 * * column 9, line 2 - line 41 * * column 11, line 7 - column 12, line 16 *; | [A]EP0386337 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC) [A] 3,4 * column 4, line 10 - line 19 * * column 8, line 30 - line 39 * | [A] - DAVARI B ET AL, "A VARIABLE-SIZE SHALLOW TRENCH ISOLATION (STI) TECHNOLOGY WITH DIFFUSED SIDEWALL DOPING FOR SUBMICRON CMOS", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, SAN FRANCISCO, DEC. 11 - 14, 1988, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19890101), no. -, pages 92 - 95, XP000566409 [A] 9 * the whole document * |