EP0606712 - Acidic aqueous cleaning compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland, California 94612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states The Clorox Company 1221 Broadway Oakland California 94612 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kong, Stephen B. 3318 Washington Court Alameda, California 94501 / US | 02 /
Blum, Robert L. 3535 Wildflower Way Concord, California 94518 / US | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1994/29] | Smith, Sydney, et al ELKINGTON AND FIFE Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308712.4 | 01.11.1993 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | US19930004091 | 13.01.1993 Original published format: US 4091 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606712 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606712 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D17/00, C02F5/08 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
C11D17/003 (EP,US);
C11D3/20 (KR);
C02F5/08 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,KR,US);
C11D1/65 (EP,US);
C11D3/2079 (EP,US);
C11D3/2082 (EP,US);
C11D3/2086 (EP,US);
C11D3/3418 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | Sauere wässrige Reinigerzusammensetzungen | [1994/29] | English: | Acidic aqueous cleaning compositions | [1994/29] | French: | Des compositions de nettoyage acides aqueuses | [1994/29] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0411708 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [X] 1-5,11-14 * page 3, line 48 - page 4, line 22 * * page 6, line 1 - line 5 * * page 7, line 12 - line 28; claims 1,12-14 * [Y] 6-10; | [Y]EP0265979 (AKZO NV [NL]) [Y] 6-10 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 37; claims 1-11 *; | [Y]EP0298172 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 10 * page 5, line 1 - line 6; claims 1-10 *; | [PX]WO9314181 (OLIN CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4 * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 8 * * page 5, line 3 - line 29; claims 1,3,7 * |