EP0599499 - Self-contained emergency shutdown valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.1997 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cooper Cameron Corporation 515 Post Oak Blvd. Suite 1200 Houston, Texas 77027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states Cooper Cameron Corporation 515 Post Oak Blvd. Suite 1200 Houston, Texas 77027 / US | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states Cooper Industries Inc. 1001 Fannin, Suite 4000 Houston Texas 77002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Gerald S. 10610 Olympia Houston, Texas 77042 / US | [1996/36] |
Former [1994/22] | 01 /
Baker, Gerald S. 10610 Olypia Houston, Texas 77042 / US | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | Jackson, Peter Arthur, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/22] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93308728.0 | 01.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | US19920979908 | 23.11.1992 Original published format: US 979908 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599499 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599499 | Date: | 11.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16K17/164, F16K17/04 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
F16K17/042 (EP,US);
F16K17/164 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7725 (EP,US);
Y10T137/773 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/22] | Title | German: | Selbständiges Sicherheitsventil für Notfälle | [1994/22] | English: | Self-contained emergency shutdown valve | [1994/22] | French: | Vanne indépendante pour arrêt d'urgence | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 29.09.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2225089 (GIMEG UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [DXY]US3429321 (THRALL WALTER I) [DX] 1,2,6 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7-10; | [DY]US5046376 (BAKER GERALD S [US]) [DY] 4,5,7-10 * abstract *; | [DA]US3198207 (BAKER WILLIAM J) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US3760845 (ATKINSON E) [A] 1 * abstract * |