EP0599529 - Method and apparatus for picture coding and method and apparatus for picture decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006-banchi, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Toshiya 1-5-107, Akeno-cho Takatsuki-shi, Osaka, 569 / JP | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309121.7 | 15.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | JP19920314815 | 25.11.1992 Original published format: JP 31481592 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0599529 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0599529 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599529 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/32, H04N7/26, H04N7/30, H04N7/50, H04N7/36 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04N19/85 (EP);
H04N19/105 (EP);
H04N19/112 (EP);
H04N19/137 (EP);
H04N19/14 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP);
H04N19/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/34] | H04N7/13, H04N7/137, H04N7/26, H04N7/30, H04N7/50, H04N7/36 | ||
Former IPC [1994/22] | H04N7/13, H04N7/137 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bildkodierung und Verfahren und Gerät zur Bilddekodierung | [1994/22] | English: | Method and apparatus for picture coding and method and apparatus for picture decoding | [1994/22] | French: | Méthode et appareil de codage d'image et méthode et appareil de décodage d'image | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Request for further processing for: | 27.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 27.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.05.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4217609 (HATORI ET AL.) [X] 1,5-7 * column 10, line 21 - line 35 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]WO8704033 (BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION) [Y] 1-4 * page 2, line 13 - page 4, line 3 *; | [A]JPS58137379 ; | [A]US3761613 (LIMB) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 44 - column 11, line 20 *; | [A]EP0510972 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 48 * | [Y] - OHTSUKA ET AL., "Development of 135 Mbit/s HDTV codec", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 4, no. 4/5, doi:doi:10.1016/0923-5965(92)90010-D, pages 379 - 387, XP000293755 [Y] 1 * page 380, column 2, line 1 - line 25; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(92)90010-D | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831108), vol. 7, no. 251, Database accession no. (E - 209), & JP58137379 A 19830815 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - IRIE ET AL., "ADAPTIVE SUB-BAND DCT CODING FOR HDTV SIGNAL TRANSMISSION", SIGNAL PROCESSING IMAGE COMMUNICATION., AMSTERDAM NL, vol. 2, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0923-5965(90)90009-7, pages 333 - 341, XP000233223 [A] 1-7 * page 334, column 1, line 16 - page 336, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(90)90009-7 |