EP0599531 - Process for production of 2-acetylbenzo b thiophene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.07.1998 [1998/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | For all designated states IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co., Ltd. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taito-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP | ||
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co., Ltd. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yazawa, Naoto, c/o Ihara Chemical Ind. Co., Ltd. Kenkyusho, 2256, Nakanogo, Fujikawa-cho Ihara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Saito, Yoshinori, c/o Ihara Chemical Ind. Co. Ltd. Kenkyusho, 2256, Nakanogo, Fujikawa-cho Ihara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Hiyoshi, Hidetaka, c/o Ihara Chemical Ind. Co. Ltd Kenkyusho, 2256, Nakanogo, Fujikawa-cho Ihara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1994/22] | Application number, filing date | 93309129.0 | 16.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | JP19920335205 | 20.11.1992 Original published format: JP 33520592 | [1994/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599531 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599531 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/56 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
C07D333/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1994/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Acetyl-Benzo B Thiophen | [1994/22] | English: | Process for production of 2-acetylbenzo b thiophene | [1994/22] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 2-acétylbenzo B Thiophène | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 07.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PYPX]JPH05155881 ; | [PA]US5169961 (DICKMAN DANIEL A [US], et al) [PA] 1-7; | [A]US2634201 (MOWRY DAVID T, et al) [A] 1-7 | [PYX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931005), vol. 17, no. 551, Database accession no. (C - 1117), & JP05155881 A 19930622 (SUMITOMO SEIKA CHEM CO LTD) [PY] 1-7 * abstract * [PX] 1-7 | [DY] - MARTYNOFF. M, "Recherches sue les alpha-acylthionaphtenes et leurs dérivés azotés", COMPTES RENDUS, (1952), vol. 234, pages 736 - 738 [DY] 1-7 | [A] - G. DORE ET AL, "Benzo[1]thiéno(2,3d)pyridazines I", TETRAHEDRON, (1972), vol. 28, no. 9, pages 2553 - 2573 [A] 1-7 *see tableau 1, page 2555, compound 10* | [Y] - HSIAO, CHI-NUNG ET AL, "A practical synthesis of 2-carbonylbenzo[b]thiophenes", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1990), vol. 20, no. 11, pages 1687 - 1695 [Y] 1-7 |