EP0598617 - Electrically programmable polarity connector for an implantable body tissue stimulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | Change - withdrawal | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACESETTER, INC. 15900 Valley View Court Sylmar, CA 91392-9221 / US | [1996/17] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT St Martin Strasse 76 D-81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Leslie S. 20409 Jay Carroll Drive Saugus CA 91350 / US | 02 /
Helland, John R. 2414 239th Place NE Redmond WA 98053 / US | [1994/21] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309194.4 | 18.11.1993 | [1994/21] | Priority number, date | US19920979083 | 19.11.1992 Original published format: US 979083 | [1994/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0598617 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0598617 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61N1/372 | [1994/21] | CPC: |
A61N1/372 (EP,US);
A61N1/3956 (EP,US);
A61N1/3918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/21] | Title | German: | Elektrisch programmierbarer Polungsschalter für Reizstromgerät | [1994/21] | English: | Electrically programmable polarity connector for an implantable body tissue stimulator | [1994/21] | French: | Connecteur de polarité électriquement programmable pour stimulateur implantable | [1994/21] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 29.01.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/13] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/15] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US5441518 (ADAMS THEODORE P [US], et al) [E] 1-12,14,15,19-23 * the whole document *; | [E]EP0585582 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [E] 1 * the whole document *; | [PXA]EP0522693 (TELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [PX] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-8,11-15,18-23; | [YA]US5107834 (IDEKER RAYMOND E [US], et al) [Y] 1,6,14 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 41; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,7,8,11-13,15,18-23; | [YA]EP0072611 (NEUROMED INC [US]) [Y] 1,6,14 * page 3, line 24 - page 6, line 27 * * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 23 * * page 32, line 19 - page 33, line 20 * [A] 2-5,7,8,11-13,15,18-23; | [A]US4991583 (SILVIAN SERGIU [US]) [A] 1,6,14,23 * column 10, line 15 - column 11, line 19; figure 1 *; | [A]US5163427 (KEIMEL JOHN G [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 66; figures 1,2 * |