EP0600647 - Mouthpiece for drinking liquid containing cans [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states de Castro Couto, Gilberto Rua Joao Pontoni, 120, Apt. 1902, Cristo Rei Curitaba Parana / BR | For all designated states Colnago Neto, Luiz Av. Victor Ferreira do Amaral, 2596, Taruma Curitiba Parana / BR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states de Castro Couto, Gilberto Rua Joao Pontoni, 120, Apt. 1902, Cristo Rei Curitaba, Parana / BR | ||
For all designated states Colnago Neto, Luiz Av. Victor Ferreira do Amaral, 2596, Taruma Curitiba, Parana / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309239.7 | 19.11.1993 | [1994/23] | Priority number, date | BR19929204862 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: BR 9204862 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0600647 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/50, A47G19/22, B65D17/00 | [1994/23] | CPC: |
B65D25/50 (EP);
B65D2517/0049 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, GB, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | Mündung für Getränkedosen | [1994/23] | English: | Mouthpiece for drinking liquid containing cans | [1994/23] | French: | Embouchure pour boîtes contenant des boissons | [1994/23] | File destroyed: | 07.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/33] | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4054205 (BLOW ET AL) [X] 1-3,6-8 * column 3, line 6 - line 18; figures 1,5,6 * [Y] 4,5,9,10; | [YA]EP0360679 (WOLMAN) [Y] 4,5,9,10 * column 6, line 24 - line 49; figures 2A,2B * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [A]EP0193250 (VAN DER MEULEN) [A] 1-3,6-8 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 14; figures 6-8 * |