EP0602835 - Voltage control circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1994/40] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rozman, Allen Frank 1702 Waverly Court Richardson, Texas 75082 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309631.5 | 02.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920991067 | 15.12.1992 Original published format: US 991067 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602835 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602835 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
H02M1/40 (EP,US);
H02M3/33569 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/25] | Title | German: | Spannungssteuerschaltungen | [1994/25] | English: | Voltage control circuits | [1994/25] | French: | Circuits de commande de tension | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/06] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0474471 (ITT [US]) [X] 1* the whole document * |