EP0604058 - Construction anchor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025-5811 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ernst, Richard J. 1031 Auburn Woods Drive Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | 02 /
Timmerman, Mark S. 592 N.Lyle Avenue Elgin, Illinois 60123 / US | 03 /
Ham, Peter G. 2610 Oriole Trail Michigan City, IN 46360 / US | [1994/26] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309815.4 | 07.12.1993 | [1994/26] | Priority number, date | US19920994207 | 21.12.1992 Original published format: US 994207 | [1994/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0604058 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0604058 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/38, F16B13/14 | [1994/26] | CPC: |
F16B13/141 (EP,US);
Y10S411/93 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/26] | Title | German: | Bauanker | [1994/26] | English: | Construction anchor | [1994/26] | French: | Ancrage pour constructions | [1994/26] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/03] | 17.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2339088 (FISCHER ARTUR [DE]) [A] 1,3,9 * page 3, line 11 - line 32 * * page 5, line 13 - line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4729705 (HIGGINS WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 1 - line 36; figures 3,7 *; | [A]FR2435625 (SODIMETAL) [A] 1 * page 1, line 24 - line 40 * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 22; figures 1-8 * |