EP0615977 - Spiro piperidines and homologs which promote release of growth hormone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Meng-Hsin 809 Nancy Way Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 02 /
Patchett, Arthur A. 1090 Minisink Way Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 03 /
Johnston, David B.R. 53 Round Top Road Warren, NJ 07060 / US | 04 /
Tata, James R. 25 Faulkner Drive Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 05 /
Nargund, Ravi P. 3 Bosco Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 06 /
Yang, Lihu 3 Watson Court West Edison, NJ 08820 / US | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Thompson, John, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309867.5 | 08.12.1993 | [1994/38] | Priority number, date | US19920989322 | 11.12.1992 Original published format: US 989322 | US19930147226 | 03.11.1993 Original published format: US 147226 | [1994/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615977 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0615977 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, C07D471/10, A61K38/03, A61K31/445 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D471/10 (EP,US);
C07D491/10 (EP,US);
C07D495/10 (EP,US);
C07K5/021 (EP,US);
C07K5/06026 (EP,US);
C07K5/06034 (EP,US);
C07K5/06147 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/38] | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, C07D471/10, A61K37/02, A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/38] | Title | German: | Spiropiperidine and ihre Homologen, die die Ausschüttung von Wachstumshormonen stimulieren | [1994/38] | English: | Spiro piperidines and homologs which promote release of growth hormone | [1994/38] | French: | Spiro piperidines et ses homologues favorisants la libération de l'hormone de croissance | [1994/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 27.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0144230 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,10-16* example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0513974 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1,10-16 * example -; claim - * |