EP0601842 - Automated dispatcher for two-stop elevator system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | For all designated states OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahjat, Zuhair S. 1118 Fienemann Road Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | 02 /
Walker, Joseph C. 204 Hollister Drive Avon, Connecticut 06001 / US | [1994/24] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/24] | Davies, Christopher Robert Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309871.7 | 08.12.1993 | [1994/24] | Priority number, date | US19920987526 | 08.12.1992 Original published format: US 987526 | [1994/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0601842 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/20 | [1994/24] | CPC: |
B66B1/14 (KR);
B66B1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1994/24] | Title | German: | Steuerung für Aufzugssysteme mit zwei Haltestellen | [1994/24] | English: | Automated dispatcher for two-stop elevator system | [1994/24] | French: | Unité de commande d'ascenseur pour deux arrêts | [1994/24] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/35] | 24.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2230622 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 [Y] 7; | [YA]US5168133 (BAHJAT ZUHAIR S [US], et al) [Y] 7 [A] 8; | [XA]GB2148499 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3,4,5 [A] 7 |