EP0658356 - Nasal ventilation cannula [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRWAYS ASSOCIATES 144 Lower Main Street Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US | [1997/13] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states AIRWAYS LTD., INC. 144 Lower Main Street Matawan, New Jersey 07747 / US | ||
Former [1995/25] | For all designated states Landis, Robert M. 1130 Puddingstone Road Mountainside, New Jersey 07092 / US | ||
For all designated states Disanza, Wayne W. 29 Redwood Drive Toms River, New Jersey 08753 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Landis, Robert M. 1130 Puddingstone Road Mountainside, New Jersey 07092 / US | 02 /
Disanza, Wayne W. 29 Redwood Drive Toms River, New Jersey 08753 / US | [1996/16] |
Former [1995/25] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/25] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93309991.3 | 10.12.1993 | [1995/25] | Priority number, date | US19930155479 | 19.11.1993 Original published format: US 155479 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0658356 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0658356 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1995/25] | CPC: |
A61M16/0666 (EP,US);
A61M16/0633 (EP,US);
A61M16/0825 (EP,US);
A61M16/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1995/25] | Title | German: | Nasale Beatmungskanüle | [2000/45] | English: | Nasal ventilation cannula | [1995/25] | French: | Canule respiratoire nasale | [1995/25] |
Former [1995/25] | Nasale Beatmunskanüle | Examination procedure | 09.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 01.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]SU1255128 ; | [YDA]US4782832 (TRIMBLE RUSSELL L [US], et al) [YD] 4,5 * figures 5-9,18; claim 12 * [A] 1; | [Y]WO9220392 (CALOR AIR SEPARATION LTD [GB]) [Y] 9,10* figure 7; claims 6-8 * | [XY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (19870506), vol. 87, no. 17, Database accession no. 120970, & SU1255128 A 19860907 (ZAPORO HEALTH SERVICE) [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,9,10 | by applicant | SU1255128 | - E.C. FLETCHER; R.A. LUCKETT, "Reinforcement on Hourly Compliance in Nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure Users with Obstructive Sleep Apnea", AM. REV. RESPIR, DIS., (1991), vol. 143, pages 936 - 941 | - R.W. RILEY; N.B. POWELL; C. GUILLEMINAULT, "Maxillofacial Surgery and Nasal CPAP", CHEST, (1990), vol. 98, pages 1421 - 1425 | - "Surgical Treatment of Obstructive Sleep Apnea - Is Mandibular Surgery Advance?", CHEST, (1990), vol. 98, pages 1315 - 1316 | - M.H. SANDERS; N.KERN, "Obstructive Sleep Apnea Treated by Independently Adjusted Inspiratory and Expiratory Positive Airway Pressures via Nasal Mask", CHEST, (1990), vol. 98, pages 317 - 24 | - R.E. WALDHORN, "Nocturnal Nasal Intermittent Positive Pressure Ventilation with Bilevel Positive Airway Pressure (BiPAP) in Respiratory - , Failure", CHEST, (1992), vol. 101, pages 16 - 521 | - "Efficacy of Nocturnal Nasal in Patients with Restrictive Thoracic Disease", AM. REV. RESPIR. DISEASE, (1992), vol. 145, pages 365 - 371 | - N. AMBROSINO ET AL., "Physiologic Evaluation of Pressure Support Ventilation by nasal mask in Patients With Stable COPD", CHEST, (1992), vol. 101, pages 385 - 91 | - E.C. FLETCHER; R.A. LUCKETT, "The Effect of Positive Reinforcement on Hourly Compliance in Nasal Continuous Positive Airway Pressure Users with Obstructive Sleep Apnea", AM. REV. RESPIR. DIS., (1991), vol. 143, pages 936 - 941 | - "Surgical Treatment of Obstructive Sleep Apnea - Is Mandibular Surgery an Advance?", CHEST, (1990), vol. 98, pages 1315 - 1316 |