EP0619148 - Liquid jetting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiho Industries Co., Ltd. 21-44 Takanawa 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0074 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states TAIHO INDUSTRIES Co., LTD. 21-44 Takanawa 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manabe, Nobuyuki 1691 Tsujido Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Smith, Norman Ian, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Smith, Norman Ian, et al F.J. CLEVELAND & COMPANY 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310125.5 | 15.12.1993 | [1994/41] | Priority number, date | JP19930100064 | 05.04.1993 Original published format: JP 10006493 | [1994/51] |
Former [1994/41] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619148 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0619148 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/08, B05B3/02, B05B13/06 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
B05B13/069 (EP);
B05B13/06 (EP);
B05B3/02 (EP);
B05B3/14 (EP);
B08B9/0936 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1994/41] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstrahlvorrichtung | [1994/41] | English: | Liquid jetting apparatus | [1994/41] | French: | Appareil à jet de liquide | [1994/41] | Examination procedure | 06.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4426233 (MANABE) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 7 - line 17 * * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 40; figures 3,7-11 *; | [A]JPH0235981 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900419), vol. 14, no. 192, Database accession no. (C - 711)<4135> , & JP02035981 A 19900206 (TOKO GIKEN KOGYO) [A] 1 * abstract * |