EP0602964 - Laminated polyester film for magnetic recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 6-7, Minamihommachi 1-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoi, Masahiro 8-15-15, Shakujiimachi, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Saito, Yasuhiko c/o Teijin Ltd Europe Office, Postfach 24 02 21 Immermannstrasse 10, 4000 Dusseldorf / DE | 03 /
Saeki, Yasuhiro 4-1-13, Kamimizo Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Etchu, Masami 36-30, Umegaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1994/26] |
Former [1994/25] | 01 /
Hosoi, Masahiro 8-15-15, Shakujiimachi, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Saito, Yasuhiko 2345-8-14, Nishihabu-cho Matsuyama-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Saeki, Yasuhiro 4-1-13, Kamimizo Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Etchu, Masami 36-30, Umegaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1994/25] | Application number, filing date | 93310146.1 | 15.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | JP19920337169 | 17.12.1992 Original published format: JP 33716992 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602964 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602964 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/704, G11B5/64 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
G11B5/73929 (EP,US);
G11B5/62 (KR);
G11B5/73931 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/25] | Title | German: | Laminierter Polyesterfilm für magnetisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [1994/25] | English: | Laminated polyester film for magnetic recording medium | [1994/25] | French: | Film de polyester stratifié pour milieu d'enregistrement magnétique | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1994 | Examination requested [1994/52] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0504651 (DIAFOIL HOECHST CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * page 2, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 25 - line 39 * * page 3, line 42 - line 57 * * page 4, line 13 - line 20 * * page 5, line 54 - line 9 * [A] 6,7,9,11; | [A]EP0510893 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,8,10 * claims 1-3 * |