|
29.12.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.10.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.2005 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
56 |
|
26.08.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2005 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
11.05.2005 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
22 |
|
31.03.2005 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.2005 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.12.2004 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2004 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
06.02.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
03.12.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.07.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2002 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.04.2002 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.09.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.09.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
287 |
|
10.08.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
09.08.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
28 |
|
23.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.2000 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
17.12.1999 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.09.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1999 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
28.04.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.06.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.04.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.09.1997 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
18.08.1997 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.09.1996 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1994 |
Invitation to remedy deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
104 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
107 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Description |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
106 |
|
20.12.1993 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |