EP0607704 - Method and apparatus for forming a floor mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERMART USA CORPORATION 13105 NW 47th Avenue Miami Florida 33054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states INTERMART USA CORPORATION 13105 NW 47th Avenue Miami, Florida 33054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bontschek, Sholem 2 Mitchell Road, Caulfield Melbourne 3162, Victoria / AU | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310629.6 | 30.12.1993 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | US19920998288 | 30.12.1992 Original published format: US 998288 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607704 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D03D29/00, A47G27/02 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
D03D29/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Bodenmatte | [1994/30] | English: | Method and apparatus for forming a floor mat | [1994/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'un tapis de sol | [1994/30] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 01.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/03] | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE361356 (FISCHER FRANZ); | [A]US1540595 (NICKOLAUS BRAUER) [A] 1,4,5,12,13,18-20 * page 1, line 55 - line 110; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US1675881 (DENNEY LAWRENCE A); | [DA]US1686303 (WATTIE WILLIAM M); | [A]US2224563 (MARGARET CLARK) [A] 1,4,5,12,19,20 * page 3, column L, line 56 - column R, line 29; figures 1-12 * |