EP0606780 - Image processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakatsuka, Tadanori, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-Chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Niki, Toru, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-Chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Saito, Kazuyuki, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-Chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Matsumoto, Akihiro, c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-Chome Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310637.9 | 31.12.1993 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | JP19930002696 | 11.01.1993 Original published format: JP 269693 | JP19930006034 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: JP 603493 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0606780 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0606780 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606780 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/32 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
G06V30/1463 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/29] | Title | German: | Gerät und Verfahren zur Bildverarbeitung | [1994/29] | English: | Image processing method and apparatus | [1994/29] | French: | Appareil et procédé de traitement d'images | [1994/29] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98203750.9 / EP0898240 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Request for further processing for: | 11.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - T. AKIYAMA & N. HAGITA, "automated entry system for printed documents", PATTERN RECOGNITION., OXFORD, GB, (199011), vol. 23, no. 11, pages 1141 - 1154, XP000160004 [X] 1-4,10-13 * chapters 3, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0031-3203(90)90112-X | [A] - K. KISE ET AL., "VISITING CARD UNDERSTANDING SYSTEM", 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, NOVEMBER 1988, ROME, IT, pages 425 - 429, XP000013013 [A] 1-20 * page 426, column R, paragraph 3; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.1988.28258 | [A] - S. TSUJIMOTO & H. ASADA, "Understanding Multi-articled Documents", 10TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, JUNE 1990, ATLANTIC CITY, USA, pages 551 - 556, XP000166354 [A] 1-20 |