EP0607707 - Suspended ceilings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEWIS SPRING PRODUCTS LTD. Studley Road, Redditch Hereford & Worcester B98 7HJ / GB | [1994/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Malcolm Henry 8 Seedfield Close Weston Favell, Northampton NN3 3PA / GB | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Hands, Horace Geoffrey, et al LEWIS W. GOOLD & CO. Whitehall Chambers 23, Colmore Row Birmingham B3 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 93310647.8 | 31.12.1993 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | GB19930000906 | 19.01.1993 Original published format: GB 9300906 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0607707 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0607707 | Date: | 27.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/20 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
E04B9/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | Abgehängte Decke | [1994/30] | English: | Suspended ceilings | [1994/30] | French: | Plafond suspendu | [1994/30] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/27] | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE8514243U (DONN PRODUCTS GMBH) [X] 1-3 * page 4, line 13 - line 31; figure 1 * [A] 4 [Y] 5-9; | [XA]US4723749 (E. CARRARO ET AL) [X] 1 * column A; figures 2,3 * [A] 2-4,6,9; | [X]FR2288195 (HUNLAS B.V.) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3; claims 1-4 * * & GB1525125 *; | [X]US4160344 (J. A. H. BRUGMAN) [X] 1-3,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]CH514755 (ETEM) [Y] 5,7,9 * column 3, line 34 - line 39; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2643337 (J. SEIFFERT) [Y] 6,8,9 * page 12, paragraph 4; figure 1 * |