EP0551229 - Drum rotor for impulse steam turbine with blades mounted in axial grooves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states GEC ALSTHOM SA 38, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gros, Jean-Pierre 93 Boulevard d'Aulnay F-93250 Villemomble / FR | 02 /
Verschaeve, Guillaume 82, rue aux Ligneaux F-45800 St Jean de Braye / FR | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Privat, et al COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Dépt. Propriété Industrielle, 30, avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Vigand, Privat, et al SOSPI 14-16, rue de la Baume F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400019.1 | 07.01.1993 | [1993/28] | Priority number, date | FR19910000122 | 08.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9100122 | FR19920000948 | 29.01.1992 Original published format: FR 9200948 | [1993/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0551229 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0551229 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F01D5/06, F01D11/08 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D11/122 (EP,US);
F01D5/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | Trommelrotor für Impulsdampfturbine mit Schaufeln montiert in Längsnuten | [1993/28] | English: | Drum rotor for impulse steam turbine with blades mounted in axial grooves | [1993/28] | French: | Rotor tambour pour turbine à vapeur à action avec montage des ailettes dans des rainures longitudinales | [1993/28] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.1997 | LU | 31.01.1997 | [2000/07] |
Former [1998/30] | AT | 07.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR946406 (SULZER AG); | [A]GB2005359 (TION, et al); | [A]FR2404102 (SNECMA [FR]); | [A]US4477226 (CARRENO DIETHER E [US]) |