EP0558363 - Floating pontoon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS Représenté par le délégué général pour l'armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-00460 Armées / FR | [1995/52] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le Délégué Général pour l'Armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-00460 Armées / FR | ||
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS Représenté par le délégué général pour l'armement 26, Boulevard Victor F-00460 Armées / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufournaud, Marc 13, Hameau de Kerfily F-29280 Loc-Maria Plouzane / FR | 02 /
Le Lan, Jean-Yves 2, rue des Ajoncs F-56270 Ploemeur / FR | 03 /
Dugor, Loic 39, rue Louis Rode F-56100 Lorient / FR | 04 /
Joly, Anne Saint Niau F-56600 Lanester / FR | 05 /
Kergueris, Pascal Kerniaven F-56700 Kervignac / FR | 06 /
Gueguen, Pierre-Luc 3, rue Ceberet F-56100 Lorient / FR | [1993/35] | Application number, filing date | 93400276.7 | 04.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | FR19920002270 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: FR 9202270 | [1993/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558363 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558363 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/06, B63B35/34 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
B63B35/34 (EP);
E02B3/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Schwimmender Ponton | [1993/35] | English: | Floating pontoon | [1993/35] | French: | Ponton flottant | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 19.07.1995 | NL | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.10.1995 | DE | 20.10.1995 | BE | 28.02.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 19.07.1995 | |
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/21] | SE | 19.10.1995 | |
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
BE | 28.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/14] | SE | 19.10.1995 | |
DE | 20.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 19.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1136333 ; | [A]US3864920 ; | [A]GB1496812 ; | [A]DE2222750 ; | [A]EP0123988 ; | [A]FR2116846 ; | [A]GB1136970 |