EP0558411 - Fragmentation-enzyme for N-acetylheparosane, preparations containing this enzyme and process for the fragmentation using this enzyme [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.05.2000 [2000/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI-SYNTHELABO 174, Avenue de France 75635 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [2000/05] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states ELF SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salome, Marc Louis Victor Les Ormes II Bât. F1 F-31320 Castanet Tolosan / FR | 02 /
Lelong, Philippe Les Ormes - Bât. A6 F-31320 Castanet Tolosan / FR | 03 /
Tenaille d'Estais, Guy Etienne Marie Via di Vigna Murata no. 1 I-00143 Roma / IT | [1994/24] |
Former [1993/35] | 01 /
Salome, Marc Louis Victor Les Ormes II Bât. F1 F-31320 Castanet Tolosan / FR | ||
02 /
Lelong, Philippe Les Ormes - Bât. A6 F-31320 Castanet Tolosan / FR | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400478.9 | 24.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | FR19920002255 | 26.02.1992 Original published format: FR 9202255 | [1993/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558411 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/88, C12P19/26, C08B37/00 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
C12N9/88 (EP,US);
C08B37/0078 (EP,US);
C12P19/26 (EP,US);
Y10S435/849 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Enzym zur Zerkleinerung von N-Acetylheparosan, dieses Enzym enthaltende Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Zerkleinerung mittels dieses Enzyms | [1993/35] | English: | Fragmentation-enzyme for N-acetylheparosane, preparations containing this enzyme and process for the fragmentation using this enzyme | [1993/35] | French: | Enzyme destinée à la fragmentation du N-acétylhéparosane, obtention des préparations contenant cette enzyme et procédés de fragmentation utilisant cette enzyme | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 17.02.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0333243 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]US3812012 (BUSCHMANN L, et al); | [A]EP0294879 (TNO [NL]) | [A] - EUR.J.BIOCHEM vol. 116, 1981, pages 359 - 364 W.F.VANN ET AL. 'The structure of the capsular polysaccharide (K5 Antigen) of urinary-tract-infective E. coli 010:K5:H4' |