EP0558418 - Metal-ferroelectric-semiconductor type non-volatile memory cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achard, Hervé 1, place Doyen Gosse F-38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Joly, Jean-Pierre 22, place Salvador Allende F-38120 Saint-Egreve / FR | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/35] | Mongrédien, André c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400486.2 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | FR19920002304 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: FR 9202304 | [1993/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558418 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/22, G11C27/00 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
G11C11/22 (EP,US);
G11C11/223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1993/35] | Title | German: | Nicht-flüchtige Speicherzelle des Metall-Ferroelektrik-Halbleitertyps | [1993/35] | English: | Metal-ferroelectric-semiconductor type non-volatile memory cell | [1993/35] | French: | Cellule mémoire non volatile du type métal-ferroélectrique semi-conducteur | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 03.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/11] | 16.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2791759 (BROWN WALTER L); | [A]US3832700 (WU S, et al); | [A]FR2323228 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US4888630 (PATERSON JAMES L [US]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE vol. 54, no. 6, Juin 1966, pages 842 - 848 HEYMAN E.A. 'A FERROELECTRIC FIELD EFFECT DEVICE' |