EP0560664 - Varifocal fresnel zone plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kormann, René THOMSON-CSF , SCPI, BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 02 /
Oppenlander, Andréas THOMSON-CSF , SCPI, BP 329 F-92402 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400595.0 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | FR19920003007 | 13.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203007 | [1993/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560664 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/29, G02B5/18, G02B3/14 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
G02B5/1876 (EP);
G02F1/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1993/37] | Title | German: | Fresnelplatte mit veränderlicher Brennweite | [1993/37] | English: | Varifocal fresnel zone plate | [1993/37] | French: | Plaque de Fresnel à focale variable | [1993/37] | File destroyed: | 02.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0258996 ; | [Y]US4572616 ; | [A]GB2220500 ; | [A]EP0443571 ; | [A]US4795240 ; | [A]JPS58184115 ; | [A]JPS62198835 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8no. 27 (P-252)4 Février 1984 & JP-A-58 184 115 ( NIHON KOUGAKU KOGYO K.K. ) 27 Octobre 1983 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 51 (P-667)16 Février 1988 & JP-A-62 198 835 ( OLYMPUS OPTICAL ) 2 Septembre 1987 | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE vol. 304, no. 4, Août 1989HAVANT GB pages 559 - 560 'Polymer-dispersed liquid crystal devices with curved surfaces' | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS vol. 28, no. 4, 15 Février 1989NEW YORK US pages 682 - 686 KATO ET AL. 'Wavelength independant grating lens system' |