EP0560685 - Belt tensioner and transmission system using such a tensioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2 rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bristot, Pierre 5, Place de l'Eglise F-35710 Ballan / FR | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400627.1 | 11.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | FR19920002943 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9202943 | [1993/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560685 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560685 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/12 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
F16H7/1236 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0806 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0859 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0891 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Riemenspanner und Getriebe mit einem derartigen Spanner | [1993/37] | English: | Belt tensioner and transmission system using such a tensioner | [1993/37] | French: | Tendeur pour courroie et système de transmission comprenant un tel tendeur | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE512036 ; | [X]EP0289814 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]); | [XD]US4790801 (SCHMIDT DIETER [DE], et al); | [A]FR2635569 (SKF GMBH [DE]); | [AD]FR2644541 (HUTCHINSON [FR]); | [A]FR2645931 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0407261 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) |