EP0562938 - Optically addressed spatial light modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104 / JP | For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states TOMOEGAWA PAPER CO. LTD. 5-15 Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujikake, Hidea, c/o Nippon Hoso Kyokai Science & Techn. Res. Lab., 10-11, Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takizawa, Kuniharu, c/o Nippon Hoso Kyokai Science & Techn. Res. Lab., 10-11, Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Juichi, c/o Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd. Techn. Res. Lab., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Tatsushi, c/o Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd. Techn. Res. Lab., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-cho Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1994/03] |
Former [1993/39] | 01 /
Fujikake, Hidea, c/o Nippon Hoso Kyokai Science & Techn. Res. Lab., 10-11, Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takizawa, Kuniharu, c/o Nippon Hoso Kyokai Science & Techn. Res. Lab., 10-11, Kinuta 1-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Hirose, Juichi, c/o Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd. Techn. Res. Lab., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-chu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Tatsushi, c/o Tomoegawa Paper Co., Ltd. Techn. Res. Lab., 3-1, Mochimunetomoe-chu Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400730.3 | 22.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | JP19920097348 | 25.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9734892 | JP19920097446 | 25.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9744692 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562938 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/135 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/1354 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/39] | Title | German: | Optisch adressierbarer räumlicher Lichtmodulator | [1993/39] | English: | Optically addressed spatial light modulator | [1993/39] | French: | Modulateur spatial de lumière adressé optiquement | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 25.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 15.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/30] | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59128520 ; | [Y]US3932025 (LAKATOS ANDRAS I, et al); | [A]US4592984 (NISHIGAKI YUJI [JP]); | [Y]EP0449117 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0455541 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US3795517 (SUTTON R) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 257 (P-316)(1694) 24 November 1984 & JP-A-59 128 520 ( RICOH ), & JP59128520 A 19841124 | [Y] - SOVIET TECHNICAL PHYSICS LETTERS vol. 14, no. 1, January 1988, NEW YORK US pages 56 - 58 O.A.AFONIN 'OPTICALLY CONTROLLABLE TRANSPARENCIES BASED ...' | [A] - SOVIET PHYSICS TECHNICAL PHYSICS vol. 32, no. 4, April 1987, NEW YORK US pages 442 - 445 A.M.IVANOV 'HOLOGRAHIC CHARACTERISTICS OF A TWIST-EFFECT LC LIGHT MODULATOR...' PAGE 442 LEFT-HAND COLUMN |