EP0566461 - Intraocular implant for capsular bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORNEAL 76 Avenue de Saint-Mandé F-75012 Paris / FR | [1999/31] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states CORNEAL 76 Avenue de Saint-Mande F-75012 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Franceschi, François 12 Traverse du Roi de Pic, 'Les Trois Lucs' F-13012 Marseille / FR | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93400937.4 | 09.04.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | FR19920004585 | 14.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9204585 | [1993/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0566461 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0566461 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/1613 (EP);
A61F2002/1683 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | Intraokulares Implantat für Kapselsack | [1993/42] | English: | Intraocular implant for capsular bag | [1993/42] | French: | Implant intra-oculaire pour sac capsulaire | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.1999 | NL | 04.08.1999 | SE | 04.08.1999 | DK | 04.11.1999 | GB | 09.04.2000 | ES | 10.04.2000 | BE | 30.04.2000 | CH | 30.04.2000 | LI | 30.04.2000 | [2004/37] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
NL | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
DK | 04.11.1999 | ||
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
NL | 04.08.1999 | ||
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
SE | 04.08.1999 | ||
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
CH | 30.04.2000 | ||
LI | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 04.08.1999 | |
GB | 09.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 04.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2581535 (DOMILENS LABORATOIRES [FR]); | [X]EP0346245 (DOMILENS LAB [FR]); | [A]EP0359381 (ALLERGAN INC [US]); | [A]US4990159 (KRAFF MANUS C [US]); | [A]US5078740 (WALMAN GERALD B [US]) |