EP0577441 - Apparatus for analyzing speech and acoustical events [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.P.I.C. FRANCE S.A. 15 rue du Canal F-90400 Trevenans / FR | [1994/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dupret, Jean-Pierre 3 rue du Canal F-90400 Trevenans Nord / FR | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401013.3 | 20.04.1993 | [1994/01] | Priority number, date | FR19920005212 | 28.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9205212 | [1994/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0577441 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0577441 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G10L3/00, H04R25/00 | [1994/04] | CPC: |
H04R25/505 (EP);
G09B19/04 (EP);
G10L2021/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/01] | G10L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/01] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Analyse von Sprache und akustischen Ereignissen | [1994/01] | English: | Apparatus for analyzing speech and acoustical events | [1994/01] | French: | Dispositif d'analyse de la parole et des phénomènes acoustiques | [1994/01] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 01.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/19] | 02.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/18] | 04.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2610162 ; | [A]FR2142807 ; | [A]US4791672 | [X] - HEARING INSTRUMENTS, vol. 37, no. 9, septembre 1986, pages 29-31, Cleveland, US; D. GRAUPE et al.: "A self-adaptive noise filtering system" | [A] - IMAGES OF THE TWENTY-FIRST CENTURY (PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY AND SOCIETY, Seattle, Washington, USA, 9-12 novembre 1989), vol. 11, part. 5, pages 1508-1509, IEEE, New York, US; G.C. PAPAGIANNIS et al.: "A real-time multiprocessor speech processing system to aid the hearing impaired" | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, vol. 82, no. 4, octobre 1987, pages 1227-1239, New York, US; D.K. BUSTAMANTE et al.: "Principal-component amplitude compression for the hearing impaired" |