EP0568415 - Insulating method of an electrical conductor and insulated electrical wire obtained by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/44] | Insulating method of an electrical conductor and insulated electrical conductor obtained by this method | ||
[1996/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UDD-FIM S.A. 27 Faubourg de Belfort, B.P. 49 F-90101 Delle Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states UDD-FIM S.A. 27 Faubourg de Belfort, B.P. 49 F-90101 Delle Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, René 6 rue de Verdun F-90100 Delle / FR | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Dronne, Guy, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401042.2 | 22.04.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | FR19920005180 | 27.04.1992 Original published format: FR 9205180 | [1993/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568415 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568415 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01B13/06, H01B13/16 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
H01B13/065 (EP);
H01B13/165 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Isolierungsverfahren eines elektrischen Leiters und isolierter elektrischer Daht hergestellt nach diesem Verfahren | [1996/44] | English: | Insulating method of an electrical conductor and insulated electrical wire obtained by this method | [1996/44] | French: | Procédé d'isolation d'un conducteur électrique et fil électrique isolé tel qu'obtenu par la mise en oeuvre du procédé | [1996/44] |
Former [1993/44] | Isolierungsverfahren eines elektrischen Leiters und isolierter elektrischer Leiter hergestellt nach diesem Verfahren | ||
Former [1993/44] | Insulating method of an electrical conductor and insulated electrical conductor obtained by this method | ||
Former [1993/44] | Procédé d'isolation d'un conducteur électrique et conducteur électrique isolé tel qu'obtenu par la mise en oeuvre du procédé | Examination procedure | 06.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP04106812 ; | [A]GB1558163 (NORSK HYDRO AS); | [A]EP0041824 (ASS ELECT IND [GB]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 347 (E-1240)27 Juillet 1992 & JP-A-04 106812 ( TOSHIBA ) 8 Avril 1992, & JP04106812 A 00000000 |