EP0569277 - Electric lifting vehicle with a telescopic boom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | Revocation of patent | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANITOU BF 430 Rue de l'Aubinière 44150 Ancenis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states MANITOU BF 430 Rue de l'Aubinière F-44150 Ancenis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braud, Marcel Claude Le Moulin des Gévaudières F-49270 Champtoceaux / FR | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401136.2 | 03.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | FR19920005626 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9205626 | [1993/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569277 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569277 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/065 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
B66F9/0655 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1993/45] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Hubwagen mit einem teleskopischen Arm | [1993/45] | English: | Electric lifting vehicle with a telescopic boom | [1993/45] | French: | Chariot de manutention électrique à bras télescopique | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 07.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1996
15.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE WADA Fördertechnik Entwicklung und Fertigung GmbH An der Bieber 5 Langenbieber 36145 Hofbieber / DE Opponent's representative Palgen, Peter, et al, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.07.1996
15.07.1996
ADMISSIBLE WADA Fördertechnik Entwicklung und Fertigung GmbH An der Bieber 5 Langenbieber 36145 Hofbieber / DE Opponent's representative Palgen, Peter, et al, et al Palgen, Schumacher & Kolllegen Frühlingstrasse 46A 45133 Essen / DE | 01.08.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.02.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.03.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0000295 ; | [A]FR1211553 ; | [A]FR1527413 ; | [A]FR2085928 ; | [A]US3018011 ; | [A]US3047172 ; | [A]US1884862 ; | [A]FR1474254 ; | [A]FR2287411 |