EP0569279 - Elevated tension electrical power supply for feeding an auxiliary circuit of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.04.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1999 | Opposition rejected | published on 19.05.1999 [1999/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94000 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle F-94000 Creteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrier, Pierre 64, Avenue de Choisy F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Pierret, Jean-Marie 24, rue Sibuet F-75012 Paris / FR | 03 /
Brandy, Frédéric 3, rue Marcelin Berthelot F-94250 Gentilly / FR | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Martin, Jean-Jacques Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/45] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401138.8 | 03.05.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | FR19920005648 | 07.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9205648 | [1993/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569279 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569279 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/14 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
H02J7/1423 (EP);
H02J7/1438 (EP);
H02J7/143 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1993/45] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Stromversorgung eines Hilfstromkreises eines Kraftfahrzeuges mit erhöhter Spannung | [1996/38] | English: | Elevated tension electrical power supply for feeding an auxiliary circuit of a motor vehicle | [1993/45] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation électrique sous tension élevée d'un circuit auxiliaire d'un véhicule automobile | [1993/45] |
Former [1993/45] | Vorrichtung zur Hochspannungsstromversorgung eines Hilfstromkreises eines Kraftfahrzeuges | Examination procedure | 04.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/26] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.1997
ADMISSIBLE Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | 29.07.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.01.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.12.1998 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.12.1998 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1999/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0426345 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0338926 (EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]); | [A]EP0390698 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]); | [AD]EP0286510 (EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR]) |