EP0571290 - Method and apparaus for manufacturing footwear of shoes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raimbault, Jean-Pierre Le Chêne Vert, B.P. 4 F-49360 Yernay / FR | For all designated states Vidal, Jacques 14, Avenue Gustave Ferrié, Z.I. Est F-49300 Cholet / FR | [1993/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz 38/40 Allée du Closeau ZI des Richardets 93166 Noisy Le Grand Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Dawidowicz, Armand Cabinet Dawidowicz, 18, Boulevard Pereire F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401302.0 | 19.05.1993 | [1993/47] | Priority number, date | FR19920006110 | 20.05.1992 Original published format: FR 9206110 | FR19930000093 | 07.01.1993 Original published format: FR 9300093 | [1993/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571290 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571290 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A43D86/00, B29C45/14 | [1998/33] | CPC: |
B29D35/062 (EP);
B29C45/14311 (EP);
B29K2105/0097 (EP);
B29K2715/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/47] | A43D65/00, B29C45/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, PT [1993/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Schuhwerk oder Schuhen | [1993/47] | English: | Method and apparaus for manufacturing footwear of shoes | [1993/47] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un article chaussant ou d'une chaussure et machine pour sa mise en oeuvre | [1993/47] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.1998 | ES | 23.12.1998 | GB | 23.12.1998 | GR | 23.12.1998 | IT | 23.12.1998 | PT | 23.03.1999 | DE | 24.03.1999 | BE | 31.05.1999 | IE | 20.08.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
ES | 23.12.1998 | ||
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
IE | 20.08.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
IE | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
IE | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
BE | 31.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/12] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
DE | 24.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
GB | 23.12.1998 | ||
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
PT | 23.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 23.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2191969 ; | [A]US3423854 (SNOW HENRY R); | [YD]US3522343 (CHANDLER EDMOND A, et al); | [Y]GB1233373 ; | [AD]FR2241602 (USM CORP [US]); | [A]GB2091626 (SONY CORP) | [X] - DATABASE WPI Week 8801, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 88-002054 & GB-A-2 191 969 (CHOU J. J.) 31 Décembre 1987, & GB2191969 A 00000000 |