EP0576315 - Support for a doctor blade, especially for a screen printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIMOR (Société Anonyme) 36 rue d'Enghien F-75010 Paris / FR | [1993/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giard, Dominique 3 rue Denis Poisson F-75017 Paris / FR | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Derambure, Christian Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401406.9 | 02.06.1993 | [1993/52] | Priority number, date | FR19920006869 | 05.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9206869 | [1993/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576315 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/44 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
B41F15/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/52] | Title | German: | Rakelhalter, insbesondere für eine Siebdruckmaschine | [1993/52] | English: | Support for a doctor blade, especially for a screen printing machine | [1993/52] | French: | Porte-racle destiné notamment à une machine de sérigraphie | [1993/52] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/42] | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP56120349 ; | [AD]CH376083 (LUESCHER AG GEB [CH]); | [AD]DE8709832U ; | [AD]US4989511 (CLARKE JR JOSEPH P [US]); | [AD]EP0167906 | [AD] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8144, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 81-80888D & JP-A-56 120 349 (DAINIPPON PRINTING KK), & JP56120349 A 00000000 |