EP0574318 - New process for the preparation of 16-alpha-methyl-steroids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROUSSEL UCLAF 102 Route de Noisy 93230 Romainville / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ROUSSEL UCLAF 102 Route de Noisy F-93230 Romainville / FR | ||
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states ROUSSEL-UCLAF 35, Boulevard des Invalides F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buendia, Jean 3 bis, Impasse Emilie F-94170 Le Perreux Sur Marne / FR | 02 /
Roussel, Patrick 49, Avenue du Président Roosevelt F-94320 Thiais / FR | 03 /
Vivat, Michel 16, Chemin de l'Autostrade F-77400 Lagny Sur Marne / FR | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Département Brevets 20 avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude, et al ROUSSEL UCLAF, Département des Brevets, 111, Route de Noisy F-93235 Romainville Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1993/50] | Vieillefosse, Jean-Claude ROUSSEL UCLAF Département des Brevets 111, Route de Noisy F-93235 Romainville Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401482.0 | 10.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | FR19920007048 | 11.06.1992 Original published format: FR 9207048 | [1993/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574318 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574318 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07J71/00, C07J5/00 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
C07J71/0015 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07J5/0076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | Neues Verfahren zur Herstelling von 16-alpha-methyl-steroide | [1993/50] | English: | New process for the preparation of 16-alpha-methyl-steroids | [1993/50] | French: | Nouveau procédé de préparation de stéroides 16 alpha-méthylés | [1993/50] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2407967 (OMNI RESEARCH); | [AD]GB2001990 (LARK SPA); | [A]US4530795 (HUBER JOEL E [US]); | [AD]WO8707612 (UPJOHN CO [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY 1961, LETCHWORTH GB pages 4547 - 4559 J. ATTENBURROW ET AL 'Compounds Related to the Steroid Hormones. Part V. The Partial Synthesis of 21-Acetoxy-17-hydroxy-16-beta -methyl-5-alpha-pregna-9-ene-3,20-dione' |