EP0581647 - Process for preparing of soft magnetic alloys with high permeability and alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPHY S.A. Immeuble Elysées La Défense, 29 Le Parvis - La Défense 4 92072 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/05] | For all designated states IMPHY S.A. Immeuble Elysées La Défense, 29 Le Parvis - La Défense 4 F-92072 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Couderchon, Georges 43 Route de l'Etang F-58160 Sauvigny les Bois / FR | 02 /
Coutu, Lucien 1, rue Pierre Chevenard F-58160 Sauvigny les Bois / FR | 03 /
Faral, Michel 83, rue des Montapins F-58000 Nevers / FR | [1994/05] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [1998/12] |
Former [1994/05] | Mestre, Jean, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93401891.2 | 21.07.1993 | [1994/05] | Priority number, date | FR19920009462 | 30.07.1992 Original published format: FR 9209462 | [1994/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0581647 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0581647 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22B9/18, C21C7/076 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
C21C7/076 (EP,US);
C22B9/18 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von weich-magnetischen Legierungen hoher permeabilität und Legierungen | [1994/05] | English: | Process for preparing of soft magnetic alloys with high permeability and alloys | [1994/05] | French: | Procédé d'élaboration d'alliages magnétiques doux à très haute perméabilité et alliages en résultant | [1994/05] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1091343 (ARMCO INT CORP) [Y] 4,6 * claim . *; | [A]US3857702 (CORBETT P); | [Y]US4450007 (HERCHENROEDER ROBERT B [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 41 - line 46 *; | [Y]DE4105507 (KRUPP WIDIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - J.F.WADIER ET AL., "Étude des Échanges métal-laitier au cours de le refusion sous laitier d'alliages fer-nickel", MEMOIRES SCIENTIFIQUES DE LA REVUE DE METALLURGIE, PARIS FR, (197802), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 61 - 80 [Y] 1-3 *Tableau I,page 66/67;Tableau II, page 79,figure 17* |