EP0582518 - Use of a sugar preparation comprising particles coated with an indigestible dextrin, for the manufacture of food. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/06] | Food and sugar preparation containing indigestable dextrin | ||
[1998/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUTANI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 3-Banchi, 5-chome, Kita Itami Itami-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | For all designated states MATSUTANI CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 3-Banchi, 5-chome, Kita Itami Itami-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakabayashi, Shigeru 2021-1, Akurakita 1-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Hoshii, Yasuhiro 339-30, Fujigaoka 4-chome Fujiidera-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [1994/06] | Representative(s) | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Portal, Gérard, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402004.1 | 04.08.1993 | [1994/06] | Priority number, date | JP19920232719 | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 23271992 | [1994/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0582518 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0582518 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0582518 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/09, C13F3/00 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
A23G3/42 (EP,US);
A23L33/21 (EP,KR,US);
A21D2/186 (EP,US);
A23G9/34 (EP,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23L21/12 (EP,US);
A23L29/35 (EP,US);
A23L33/30 (EP,US);
A23L9/12 (EP,US);
A23P20/10 (KR);
A23P20/18 (KR);
C13B50/002 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (KR);
A23V2200/132 (KR);
A23V2200/332 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1994/06] | A23L1/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/06] | Title | German: | Verwendung von einer Zuckerbereitung enthaltend mit unversaulichen Dextrin überzogenen Zuckerteilchen, zur Herstellung von Nahrungsmitteln. | [1998/02] | English: | Use of a sugar preparation comprising particles coated with an indigestible dextrin, for the manufacture of food. | [1998/02] | French: | Utilisation d'une préparation de sucre comprennant des perticules de sucre enrobés par une dextrin indigestible, par la fabrication d'un alinent | [1998/02] |
Former [1994/06] | Unverdauliches Dextrin enthaltendes Nahrungsmittel und Zuckerprodukt | ||
Former [1994/06] | Food and sugar preparation containing indigestable dextrin | ||
Former [1994/06] | Produit alimentaire et produit de sucre contenant de la dextrine non-assimilable | Examination procedure | 07.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/01] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPY]EP0540421 (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [XP] 1-6 * claims 1-14 * * page 4, line 1 - line 50 * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 24 * * page 25, line 14 - line 56 * * example - * [Y] 7-11; | [X]EP0477089 (MATSUTANI KAGAKU KOGYO KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * claims 1,2 * * page 2, line 27 - line 30 * * page 3, line 17 - line 44 * * examples 4,5 *; | [X]WO9209208 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [X] 7 * claims 1,9 * * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]FR2243997 (CPC INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [Y] 7-11 * claims 1-3 * * page 3, line 16 - line 33 * * page 5, line 28 - line 35 *; | [A]US3642535 (GRAHAM CHARLES P, et al) [A] 7-11 * claim 1 * |