EP0638628 - Process for sweetening of petroleum fractions without regular addition of an aqueous alkaline solution, using a solid basic catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | ||
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marcilly, Christian 91 ter rue Condorcet F-78800 Houilles / FR | 02 /
Courty, Philippe 91 rue Condorcet F-78800 Houilles / FR | 03 /
Leporq, Serge 6, rue Villandry F-78200 Mantes La Ville / FR | [1995/07] | Application number, filing date | 93402014.0 | 04.08.1993 | [1995/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0638628 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0638628 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C10G27/10, B01J31/16 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
C10G27/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/07] | C10G27/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Süssen von Petroleumfraktionen ohne kontinuierliche Beimischung einer wässrigen alkalischen Lösung, unter Verwendung eines basischen Katalysators | [1995/07] | English: | Process for sweetening of petroleum fractions without regular addition of an aqueous alkaline solution, using a solid basic catalyst | [1995/07] | French: | Procédé d'adoucissement en coupes pétrolières sans adjonction régulière de solution aqueuse alcaline, utilisant un catalyseur solide basique | [1995/07] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/41] | 14.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]FR2688223 (INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) [E] 1-13,16,17 * claims 1-15 *; | [DA]FR2651791 (TOTAL) [DA] 1,11-13,16,17 * claims 1,4-6,9,12,13 * * page 5, line 35 - line 38 * * page 10, line 3 - line 8 *; | [DA]EP0252853 (TOTAL) [DA] 1,2,11,13,17 * claims 1,2,9,10,15 *; | [DA]US4498978 (UOP) |