EP0588692 - Automatic immuno-assay apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTROL DIAGNOSTIC 2, Rue d'Epiais 95380 Chennevieres les Louvres / FR | [1999/17] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states MERCK S.A. 5 à 9, rue Anquetil 94736 Nogent-sur-Marne Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states LABORATOIRES MERCK-CLEVENOT 5 à 9, Rue Anquetil F-94736 Nogent-sur-Marne Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uzan, Michel 51, Allée Robert Estienne F-93320 Pavillons-Sous-Bois / FR | 02 /
Gicquel, Thierry 55, rue Vieille Saint Martin F-95800 Courdimanche / FR | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor, et al Cabinet Orès 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Hurwic, Aleksander, et al Cabinet Orès 6, Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1994/12] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402181.7 | 08.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | FR19920010850 | 11.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9210850 | [1994/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588692 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588692 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, G01N33/543 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
B01L13/00 (EP,US);
B01L13/02 (EP,US);
B01L3/5082 (EP,US);
B01L3/5085 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/113332 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114998 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Automatische Vorrichtung zur immunologischen Dosierung | [1994/12] | English: | Automatic immuno-assay apparatus | [1994/12] | French: | Appareil automatique de dosage immunologique | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1998 | GB | 09.12.1998 | NL | 09.12.1998 | DK | 09.03.1999 | PT | 09.03.1999 | SE | 09.03.1999 | LU | 08.09.1999 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.12.1998 | |
GB | 09.12.1998 | ||
NL | 09.12.1998 | ||
DK | 09.03.1999 | ||
PT | 09.03.1999 | ||
SE | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 09.12.1998 | |
GB | 09.12.1998 | ||
NL | 09.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.03.1999 | ||
SE | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 09.12.1998 | |
GB | 09.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.03.1999 | ||
SE | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/03] | AT | 09.12.1998 | |
GB | 09.12.1998 | ||
PT | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 09.12.1998 | |
PT | 09.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | PT | 09.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3402304 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0355823 (DU PONT [US], et al) [A] * page 5, line 38 - page 6, line 31; figures 4,5 *; | [A]EP0410645 (TECHNICON INSTR [US], et al) [A] 1,4,5-7,9 * page 7, line 47 - line 51; figures 5,16-19 * * page 12, line 22 - page 13, line 15 * * page 15, line 4 - line 19 *; | [DA]WO9107662 (BIOTROL SA LAB [FR]) [DA] 1 * page 24, line 10 - page 25, line 28; figure - *; | [A]FR2655426 (NITTEC CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]EP0488247 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5,6,9 * page 7, line 4 - line 9 * |