EP0588705 - Process and installation for gas separation by permeation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fillet, Frédéric 51 rue des Morillons F-75015 Paris / FR | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402224.5 | 14.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | FR19920010902 | 14.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9210902 | [1994/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588705 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588705 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/22 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B01D53/229 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gastrennung mittels Permeation | [1994/12] | English: | Process and installation for gas separation by permeation | [1994/12] | French: | Procédé et installation de séparation de gaz par perméation | [1994/12] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1993 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 06.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.04.1998 | DK | 08.07.1998 | SE | 08.07.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | NL | 08.04.1998 | |
SE | 08.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 08.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8906158 (MEMBRANE TECH & RES INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5-10,12 * page 16, line 8 - page 18, line 18; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3818919 (BECKER GMBH & CO BETEILIGUNGS [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,12,15,22 * column 4, line 28 - line 66; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0358915 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1,5-7,10-12,14 * column 5, line 38 - column 6, line 35; figure 1; claims 1-38 *; | [YD]EP0362436 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [YD] 1,3,5,6-12,14-18,22 * column 6, line 8 - column 9, line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4941893 (HSIEH SHAN-TAO [US], et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6-12,14-18,22 * column 11, line 58 - column 13, line 17; figures 2,3 *; | [A]WO9213628 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1,5,11,12,14* page 38, line 33 - page 40, line 7; figure 1 * |