EP0588715 - Headlamp with correction unit and reset device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/12] | Headlamp with connection unit and reset device | ||
[1997/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93000 Bobigny / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André F-93000 Bobigny / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ravier, Jean-Paul 15 avenue Galliéni F-94100 St Maur des Fosses / FR | 02 /
Penet, Jean-Claude 11 Chemin des Hauts Bouillons F-77400 Lagny/Marne / FR | 03 /
Metayer, Guy 50 rue des Carrières F-92150 Suresnes / FR | 04 /
Le Quinio, Hervé 146 boulevard de Grenelle F-75015 Paris / FR | 05 /
Pinson, Chislaine 66 avenue de Verdun F-92390 Villeneuve la Garenne / FR | 06 /
Billot, Gérard 36 rue du Lavoir F-93370 Montfermeil / FR | 07 /
Reynal, Alain 5 allée du Goulet F-93130 Noisy le Sec / FR | 08 /
Bolis, Jean 36 rue du Pressoir F-93470 Coubron / FR | [1994/12] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/12] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402243.5 | 15.09.1993 | [1994/12] | Priority number, date | FR19920011101 | 17.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9211101 | [1994/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0588715 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0588715 | Date: | 09.04.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076, B60Q1/068 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0683 (EP);
B60Q1/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/12] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer mit Korrektureinheit und Rückstelleinrichtung | [1994/12] | English: | Headlamp with correction unit and reset device | [1997/15] | French: | Projecteur comportant un dispositif correcteur et des moyens de réglage du zéro du dispositif correcteur | [1994/12] |
Former [1994/12] | Headlamp with connection unit and reset device | Examination procedure | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE2339837 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [DX] 1-4,19 * figures 3,13 *; | [DX]DE7414276U (WESTFÄLISCHE METALL INDUSTRIE KG HUECK & CO) [DX] 1,19 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2630068 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [A] 1 * figure 1 * | Examination | EP0484938 |