EP0597736 - Railway rail welding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRAVAUX DU SUD-OUEST Chemin du Corps de Garde 77500 Chelles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states TRAVAUX DU SUD-OUEST Chemin du Corps de Garde F-77500 Chelles / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perron, Loic 5 Route de Villevaudé, La Pomponnette F-77400 Lagny Sur Marne / FR | [1994/20] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | Loyer, Bertrand Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402315.1 | 22.09.1993 | [1994/20] | Priority number, date | FR19920013455 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: FR 9213455 | [1994/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0597736 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0597736 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E01B11/50, E01B29/44 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
E01B11/50 (EP);
B23K11/0073 (EP);
B23K2101/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schweissen von Eisenbahnschienen | [1994/20] | English: | Railway rail welding method | [1994/20] | French: | Procédé de soudage de rails de chemin de fer | [1994/20] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 02.01.1997 | GR | 02.01.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 02.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2394641 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ [AT]) [A] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2840916 (PLASSER BAHNBAUMASCH FRANZ) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DD225461 (DEUTSCHE REICHSBAHN [DD]) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2612532 (SUD OUEST TRAVAUX [FR]) |