EP0595684 - Transverse drive train assembly with axial offset [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT S.A. Service 0267, 34, quai du Point du Jour 92109 Boulogne Billancourt Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/18] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT S.A. Service 0267, 34, quai du Point du Jour F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valentin, Daniel 67, Avenue de Buzenval F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [1994/18] | Application number, filing date | 93402562.8 | 19.10.1993 | [1994/18] | Priority number, date | FR19920013007 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: FR 9213007 | [1994/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0595684 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0595684 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/08 | [1994/18] | CPC: |
B60K17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1994/18] | Title | German: | Quer angeordnete Kraftübertragungsanordnung mit axialem Versatz | [1994/18] | English: | Transverse drive train assembly with axial offset | [1994/18] | French: | Ensemble de transmission transversal à déport axial | [1994/18] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.11.1996 | IT | 27.11.1996 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 27.11.1996 | |
IT | 27.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 27.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4658661 (TERASHITA) [Y] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 39 - line 68 * * column A; figure 1 * [A] 3,4; | [DY]FR2670856 (LUK LAMELLEN UND KUPPLINGSBAU GMBH) [DY] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3736838 (DAIMLER-BENZ) [Y] 1,6 * column 2, line 9 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4027901 (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]DE3413818 (FICHTEL & SACHS) [A] 1,6 * the whole document * |