EP0599687 - Make up composition containing a fullerene or a mixture of fullerenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mellul, Myriam 17, Allée du Parc de la Bièvre F-94240 L'Hay les Roses / FR | [1994/22] | Representative(s) | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard NONY & ASSOCIES 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/22] | Stalla-Bourdillon, Bernard CABINET NONY & CIE 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402756.6 | 12.11.1993 | [1994/22] | Priority number, date | FR19920013675 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: FR 9213675 | [1994/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599687 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0599687 | Date: | 29.05.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/02, A61K7/48, A61K7/043 | [1994/22] | CPC: |
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q1/06 (EP,US);
A61Q1/10 (EP,US);
A61Q1/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/22] | Title | German: | Schminke enthaltend eine Fullerene oder eine Mischung von Fullerenen | [1994/22] | English: | Make up composition containing a fullerene or a mixture of fullerenes | [1994/22] | French: | Composition cosmétique de maquillage contenant un fullerène ou un mélange de fullerènes | [1994/22] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 07.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH0517328 ; | [XP]JPH0517327 ; | [A]US5114477 (MORT JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-4* column W * | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 09, Database accession no. 93-71008, & JP517328 A 00000000 (KANEBO) [XP] 1-4,8,13 * abstract * | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 2, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 09, Database accession no. 93-71007, & JP517327 A 00000000 (KANEBO) [XP] 1-4,8,13 * abstract * |