EP0610637 - Elastic impermeable membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1999/32] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Le Rossignol, Benoît 99, Rue de Dinan F-35000 Rennes / FR | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-François PSA - PEUGEOT - CITROEN, Centre Technique CITROEN, Propriété Industrielle, Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Robert, Jean-François PSA - PEUGEOT - CITROEN, Centre Technique CITROEN, Propriété Industrielle, Route de Gisy F-78140 Velizy / FR | Application number, filing date | 93402968.7 | 09.12.1993 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | FR19930000252 | 13.01.1993 Original published format: FR 9300252 | [1994/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610637 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610637 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/38, F16J3/02 | [1999/13] | CPC: |
F16J3/00 (EP,US);
F15B1/10 (EP,US);
F15B2201/205 (EP,US);
F15B2201/3151 (EP,US);
F15B2201/3155 (EP,US);
F15B2201/32 (EP,US);
F15B2201/61 (EP,US);
Y10T428/266 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/33] | F15B1/047, F16J3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1994/33] | Title | German: | Elastische, undurchlässige Membran | [1994/33] | English: | Elastic impermeable membrane | [1994/33] | French: | Membrane élastique imperméable | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/48] | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6479438 ; | [DA]EP0360648 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2662638 (NOK CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0482916 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1 * claim 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890630), vol. 013, no. 287, Database accession no. (M - 844), & JP01079438 A 19890324 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | Examination | - C.A.FINCH, Polyvinyl Alkohol, PAGES 352-383, 523-528; 1973, JOHN WILEY & SONS LTD |