EP0586315 - Assembly for recharging storage batteries of a electrically driven vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABLECO Z.I. de la Pontchonnière F-69210 Savigny / FR | For all designated states Poumey, Michel Chateau le Treuil F-69130 Ecully / FR | [1994/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poumey, Michel Château le Treuil F-69130 Ecully / FR | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Laurent, Michel, et al Cabinet LAURENT et CHARRAS, 20, rue Louis Chirpaz B.P. 32 F-69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420351.4 | 26.08.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | FR19920010673 | 02.09.1992 Original published format: FR 9210673 | [1994/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0586315 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
B60L53/30 (EP,US);
B60L53/122 (EP,US);
B60L53/34 (EP,US);
B60L53/39 (EP,US);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J7/0042 (EP,US);
B60L2210/30 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Einheit zum Wiederaufladen von Akkumulatorbatterien eines elektrisch angetriebenen Kraftfahrzeugs | [1994/10] | English: | Assembly for recharging storage batteries of a electrically driven vehicle | [1994/10] | French: | Ensemble pour recharger les batteries d'accumulateurs d'un véhicule automobile électrique | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1998/49] | 20.07.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2434890 (ELEKTR STRASSENVERKEHR GES [DE]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]US4347472 (LEMELSON JEROME H) [Y] 1-4 * column 3, line 5 - line 66 * [A] 5-8; | [A]DE3131105 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]US4379988 (MATTATALL PATRICIO [US]) [Y] 2 * column A * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 46; figures 2,7 *; | [A]WO8404212 (TOWMOTOR CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5; claims 1-13 *; | [YA]EP0385502 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * column 2, line 4, paragraphs 1-5 - column 3, line 13 * [A] 5-8; | [Y]US5122729 (ITOGA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * column W *; | [AP]US5157319 (KLONTZ KEITH W [US], et al) [AP] 1-8* column W * |