EP0631362 - Reactive power-compensating arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA 40, avenue André Morizet F-92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [1994/52] | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN 2, chemin des Sources F-38240 Meylan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theoleyre, Serge MERLIN GERIN - Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | 02 /
Lupin, Jean-Marc MERLIN GERIN - Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [1994/52] | Representative(s) | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Schneider Electric SA Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Schneider Electric SA, Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1994/52] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée MERLIN GERIN Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420418.1 | 27.10.1993 | [1994/52] | Priority number, date | FR19930007599 | 21.06.1993 Original published format: FR 9307599 | [1994/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0631362 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/18, G05F1/70 | [1994/52] | CPC: |
H02J3/1828 (EP);
Y02E40/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/52] | Title | German: | Blindleistungskompensationsanordnung | [1994/52] | English: | Reactive power-compensating arrangement | [1994/52] | French: | Dispositif de compensation de puissance réactive | [1994/52] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 28.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 10.06.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/49] | 10.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4317076 (PRICE) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 12 * * column 9, line 4 - line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH01280811 ; | [A]EP0168147 (ARTHUR TREVOR WILLIAMS) [A] * the whole document * | [A] - HARDER ET AL, "distribution capacitor control -an overview", 1985 RURAL ELECTRIC POWER CONFERENCE, SPRINGFIELD,ILLINOIS, (19850428), pages 1 - 7 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900131), vol. 14, no. 054, Database accession no. (P - 999), & JP01280811 A 19891113 (MITSUBISHI) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - MERELLI, "new vigilance on cos phi power factor correction", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [ ] - MESURES, FRANCE, (19870525), vol. 52, no. 8, pages 49 - 53 |