EP0603086 - Blade for machines like portable brush cutters and lawn mowers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lays, Louis Lieu dit "Les Mûres" F-42240 Saint Maurice en Gourgois / FR | [1994/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1997/01] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [1995/28] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1994/25] | Dupuis, François, et al Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93420485.0 | 08.12.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | FR19920015125 | 10.12.1992 Original published format: FR 9215125 | [1994/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0603086 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0603086 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/73 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
A01D34/736 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | Messer für Maschinen wie zum Beispiel tragbare Sichelmäher und Rasenmäher | [1994/25] | English: | Blade for machines like portable brush cutters and lawn mowers | [1994/25] | French: | Lame pour machines du type débrousailleuses portables et tondeuses à gazon notamment | [1994/25] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 13.01.1995 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1995 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.1997 | DK | 12.03.1997 | ES | 12.03.1997 | GB | 12.03.1997 | GR | 12.03.1997 | IT | 12.03.1997 | NL | 12.03.1997 | PT | 12.06.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | DE | 13.06.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
NL | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DK | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 12.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1563526 (SPERRY RAND) [X] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 18 - page 4, line 26; figure - * [A] 2,10; | [X]US3621642 (LEAKE HARRY A JR) [X] 1,2,6 * column W *; | [XDAY]US3894385 (BROWN JR CHARLES K) [XD] 1,2,10 * column 2, line 5 - column 3, line 10; figures 2-4 * [A] 5-8 [Y] 3; | [XDAY]DE2448130 (MAERZ GERHARD DR ING) [XD] 1,2,4,5,10 * the whole document * [A] 9 [Y] 3; | [A]DE3838427 (SCHNEIDER ALOIS [DE]) [A] 4,5* figure .; claims 1,2 * |