EP0591086 - Low temperature chemical vapor deposition and method for depositing a tungsten silicide film with improved uniformity and reduced fluorine concentration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gow, Thomas Richard 4 Lyman Drive Williston, VT 05495 / US | 02 /
Lebel, Richard John Box 2255A RD1 Sheldon, VT 05483 / US | [1994/14] | Representative(s) | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/14] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 93480132.5 | 10.09.1993 | [1994/14] | Priority number, date | US19920954783 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: US 954783 | [1994/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0591086 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0591086 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/285, H01L21/3205, C23C16/44, C23C16/42 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
C23C16/42 (EP);
C23C16/0272 (EP);
H01L21/28061 (EP);
H01L21/28556 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/14] | H01L21/3205, C23C16/44, C23C16/42, H01L21/285 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/14] | Title | German: | Niedrigtemperatur-CVD-Verfahren, zur Abscheidung einer Wolframsilizid-Schicht mit einer verbesserten Uniformität und einer reduzierten Fluorin-Konzentration | [1994/14] | English: | Low temperature chemical vapor deposition and method for depositing a tungsten silicide film with improved uniformity and reduced fluorine concentration | [1994/14] | French: | Méthode CVD à basse température, pour déposer un film de siliciure de tungstène présentant une uniformité améliorée et une concentration réduite en fluorine | [1994/14] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 29.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/32] | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0254651 (NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K.) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9,11,12,15,16,18,19,22 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 9 * * column 4, line 34 - line 51; figure 8 * * column 9, line 33 - column 10, line 2 * * claims 1,4-6,11,12,26,27 * [Y] 3,6,7,10,13,14,17,20,21,24; | [XAY]EP0254654 (NIHON SHINKU GIJUTSU K.K.) [X] 1,8,15,22 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 25; figures 5,6 * * column 6, line 61 - line 65; figure 12; claims 1-3 * [A] 2-5,9-12,16-19 [Y] 6,7,13,14,20,21; | [XA]JPH0266173 ; | [X]JPS61183199 ; | [A]JPH01191447 ; | [A]US4966869 (JOSEPH T. HILLMAN) [A] 22,24 * column 2, line 15 - line 24 * * column 2, line 54 - line 60 *; | [PA]KR930006720B | [YA] - T. HARA ET AL., "Film nucleation uniformity of tungsten silicide deposited using dichlorosilane reduction", EXTENDED ABSTRACTS OF THE FALL MEETING, HOLLYWOOD, FL., US., PRINCETON, NEW JERSEY US, (1989), vol. 89/2, pages 543 - 544, XP000276984 [Y] 3,10,17 * page 543, column L * [A] 1,8,14,15,21,22 | [Y] - TOHRU HARA ET AL., "Composition of CVD tungsten silicides", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (198705), vol. 134, no. 5, pages 1302 - 1306 [Y] 24 * page 1302, column L; figure 7 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900525), vol. 14, no. 246, Database accession no. (C - 722), & JP02066173 A 19900306 (ANELVA CORP.) [X] 1,8,22 * abstract * [A] 3,10,25,27-30 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870107), vol. 11, no. 3, Database accession no. (C - 395), & JP61183199 A 19860815 (FUJITSU LTD.) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891102), vol. 13, no. 483, Database accession no. (E - 839), & JP01191447 A 19890801 (FUJITSU LTD.) [A] 1,15,22,25 * abstract * | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 08, Database accession no. 94-062746, & KR930006720B B1 19930723 (HYUNDAI ELECTRONIC IND. CO.) [PA] 1,8,22 * abstract * |