EP0603106 - Method to reduce stress from trench structure on SOI wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chidambarrao, Dureseti 5 Clearview Drive Sandy Hook, Connecticut 06482 / US | 02 /
Hsu, Louis Lu-Chen 7 Crosby Court Fishkill, NY 12524 / US | 03 /
Mis, Daniel J. 24 Horizon Hill Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | 04 /
Peng, James Ping 20 Kellerhause Drive Poughkeepsie, NY 12603 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Klein, Daniel Jacques Henri Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 93480199.4 | 19.11.1993 | [1994/25] | Priority number, date | US19920991010 | 16.12.1992 Original published format: US 991010 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0603106 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/76 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
H01L21/76264 (EP,US);
H01L21/3065 (EP,US);
H01L21/763 (EP,US);
H01L21/76286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduzierung des Stress einer Grabenstruktur für ein SOI-Typ Substrat | [1994/25] | English: | Method to reduce stress from trench structure on SOI wafer | [1994/25] | French: | Procédé pour réduire le stress d'une structure de rainure pour un substrat du type SOI | [1994/25] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 15.10.1996 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |