EP0574344 - Improved grating frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1995 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLASTICAS ELME, S.L. Poligono Industrial Lardero 26002 Lardero (La Rioja) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states PLASTICAS ELME, S.L. Poligono Industrial Lardero E-26002 Lardero, La Rioja / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafuente Martinez, Elias Pol. Ind. Lardero E-26002 Lardero, La Rioja / ES | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 28080 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 28080 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1995/09] | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 E-28080 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [1993/50] | Urizar Anasagasti, José Antonio URYAS P.O. Box 61051 E-28080 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 93500076.0 | 07.06.1993 | [1993/50] | Priority number, date | ES19920001825U | 08.06.1992 Original published format: ES 9201825 U | ES19920002666 | 31.12.1992 Original published format: ES 9202666 | [1993/50] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574344 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/58, E06B3/68 | [1993/50] | CPC: |
E06B3/685 (EP);
E06B3/5892 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, PT [1993/50] | Title | German: | Verbesserte Gitterung | [1993/50] | English: | Improved grating frame | [1993/50] | French: | Grillage perfectionné | [1993/50] | File destroyed: | 11.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/26] | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1995/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3760543 ; | [Y]US4413397 ; | [Y]US3903669 |