EP0584036 - Dynamically balanced co-orbiting scrolls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states CARRIER CORPORATION Carrier Tower 6304 Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800 Syracuse New York 13221 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bush, James William 11 Academy Street Skaneateles, New York 13152-1201 / US | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 93630057.3 | 12.08.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | US19920931738 | 18.08.1992 Original published format: US 931738 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0584036 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0584036 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/02, F01C21/00 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
F01C1/023 (EP,US);
F01C17/066 (EP,US);
F01C21/003 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR);
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C23/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/08] | Title | German: | Dynamisch ausgeglichene Verdrängermaschine nach dem Spiralprinzip | [1994/08] | English: | Dynamically balanced co-orbiting scrolls | [1994/08] | French: | Machine du type à volutes à équilibrage dynamique | [1994/08] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.10.1996 | ES | 16.10.1996 | IT | 16.10.1996 | LI | 16.10.1996 | SE | 16.01.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | CH | 16.10.1996 | |
ES | 16.10.1996 | ||
IT | 16.10.1996 | ||
LI | 16.10.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 16.10.1996 | |
IT | 16.10.1996 | ||
LI | 16.10.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | CH | 16.10.1996 | |
LI | 16.10.1996 | ||
SE | 16.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | SE | 16.01.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3874827 (YOUNG NIELS O) [DA] 1-4 * column W *; | [A]JPH03149384 ; | [PA]EP0548001 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0548002 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP0548003 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910920), vol. 15, no. 374, Database accession no. (M - 1160), & JP03149384 A 19910625 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO.) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |